Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Deans, Arun Michael (CPSO#: 64892)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Apr 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Apr 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

330 Bronte St Suite 108
Milton ON  L9T 7X1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Michael Deans Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Deans ( CPSO# 64892 )

Business Address:
Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Road East
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
330 Bronte Street
Suite 108
Milton ON  L9T 7X1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARUN MICHAEL DEANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEANS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1992