Deb, Bakul Kanti (CPSO#: 83752)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Chittagong, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2005 to 07 Nov 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Nov 2005 to 30 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Sep 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2007