Deb, Chameli (CPSO#: 98800)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Nov 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:North Bengal University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone: (519) 352-6400
Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHAMELI DEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 25 Aug 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Mar 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Apr 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2017