Deb, Pratima (CPSO#: 50411)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Calcutta, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Pathology Department
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8K 1A1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76637
Fax: (905) 521-6192
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRATIMA DEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEB is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1992