Debly, Daina Leigh (CPSO#: 89326)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: Kumaranayake, Daina Debly (used until: 25 Mar 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare
Fontbonne Building 4th Floor
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33674
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.L. Debly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Debly ( CPSO# 89326 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Healthcare
Fontbonne Building 4th Floor
50 Charlton Avenue East
Suite 413
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAINA LEIGH DEBLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEBLY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014