Debono, Alaine Marie (CPSO#: 58245)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
204-186 Erie Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 4T3
Phone: (705) 445-5102
Fax: (705) 445-1375
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAINE MARIE DEBONO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEBONO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1988