Debow, Gary (CPSO#: 21040)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Nov 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Nov 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1969
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Nov 1999