Dec, David Allan (CPSO#: 68004)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5400 Portage Road
Unit 602
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5X7
Phone: (905) 356-2228
Fax: (905) 356-8161
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Dec Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dec ( CPSO# 68004 )

Business Address:
602 - 5400 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5X7
Phone Number: (905) 356-2228

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ALLAN DEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1996