Decarie, Jean Claude (CPSO#: 63598)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Creole, English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2009