Deck, John Henry Northcote (CPSO#: 15806)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 29 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist
Neuropathology Effective: 17 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1956
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Oct 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 2010