Deeb, Shamsa Milad (CPSO#: 80922)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Oct 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Winchester District Memorial Hosp
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420 Ext. 6318
Fax: (613) 774-7206
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2 lorry Greenberg Drive
Suite 500
Ottawa ON  K1G 5H6
Canada
Phone: (613) 248-3337
Fax: (613) 248-3336
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shamsa Deeb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Deeb ( CPSO# 80922 )

Business Address:
Winchester District Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2420

Business Address:
2 Lorry Greenberg Drive
Suite 500
Ottawa ON  K1G 5H6
Phone Number: (613) 248-3337

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 07 Jun 2004 to 04 Jul 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 05 Jul 2004 to 02 Oct 2004
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 03 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 16 Oct 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 16 Oct 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 16, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Shamsa Milad Deeb, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Deeb to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")

                                                of

                                    DR. SHAMSA MILAD DEEB
                                          ("Dr. Deeb")

                                                to 

                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Deeb, certificate of registration number 80922, am a member of the
                  College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of
                  practice.

            (2)   I, Dr. Deeb, acknowledge that I am currently the subject of a complaint
                  bearing File Number 96579 regarding my care and treatment of a patient. 


            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Deeb, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it. 

            (4)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Deeb, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Deeb, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review at least ten (10) of my patient charts related to
                              abnormal uterine bleeding once every month for a minimum of
                              six (6) months, which may be reduced to ten charts reviewed
                              quarterly for a further six months, with approval of the
                              College;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me once every month for a minimum of six (6)months,
                              to be reduced to quarterly with College approval until I have
                              been supervised for a total of 12 months;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College after each meeting or
                              more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has concerns
                              about my standard of practice, or if I have failed to comply
                              with the terms of this undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Deeb, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected
                        by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my Undertaking, as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the investigation, and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.  
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Deeb, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Deeb, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        days of the date the Inquiries Complaints and Reports Committee
                        approves this Undertaking.  
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Deeb, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Deeb, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (3)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Deeb, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (3)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my Certificate of Registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Deeb, undertake to successfully complete the following
                        professional education:
                  
                        (i)   all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "B",  under the guidance of my Clinical Supervisor(s);
                  
                        (ii)  successfully complete an educational program(s) satisfactory
                              to the College in medical record keeping;
                  
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Deeb, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        professional education set out in section (5)(a).
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Deeb, undertake to complete the requirement in section
                        5(a)(ii) within six months of the date of execution of this
                        undertaking or, if no satisfactory program is available by that
                        time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Deeb, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out above
                        in section (5)(a) as soon as possible.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Deeb, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (4) above
                        and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of my
                        practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected
                        by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and agree that
                        the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of
                        my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Deeb, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking , and to abide by
                        those recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the
                        Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Deeb, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Deeb, understand and agree that if I am of the view that any
                        of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have
                        thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further understand and agree that thereafter, the Inquiries,
                        Complaints and Reports Committee ("ICR Committee") will consider my
                        submissions and make a determination regarding whether or not the
                        recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if so, whether
                        they, or any of them, constitute limitations or restrictions on my
                        practice, and that decision will be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Deeb, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (5)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Deeb, hereby consent to the inclusion, on the public
                        register as a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of
                        registration, for the purposes of Section 23 of the Health
                        Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated
                        Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended, of any
                        of those recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are limitations
                        and restrictions on my practice and which the ICR Committee has
                        identified in its decision referenced in section (6)(d) as
                        limitations and restrictions on my practice.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Deeb, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Deeb, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Deeb, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), and/or any person or institution who may have relevant
                        information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with
                        the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Deeb, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C".
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Deeb, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Deeb, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Deeb, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Deeb, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Deeb, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which
                  is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991,
                  c. 18, as amended. I understand that this Undertaking shall be
                  information on the College's Register that is available to the public
                  during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (13)  I, Dr. Deeb, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Deeb was the subject of a complaint regarding her care and
                        treatment of a patient.  As a result of the investigation:
                  
                        *     Dr. Deeb will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months. 
                  
                        *     Dr. Deeb will engage in professional education in medical
                              record keeping
                  
                        *     Dr. Deeb's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within six months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Deeb, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (5) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (15)  I, Dr. Deeb, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, (or, if applicable,  a colleague
                  with similar responsibilities), at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of
                  Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the
                  College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this
                  Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Deeb, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates my
                  completion of the professional education set out in section (5) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        education set out at section (5) above and which he or she
                        reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: November 4, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Member
Active Date: October 15, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Shamsa Milad Deeb to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 16, 2015:

Dr. Deeb was the subject of a complaint regarding her care and treatment of a patient. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Deeb will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.

Dr. Deeb will engage in professional education in medical record keeping

Dr. Deeb's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.