Deeks, Shelley Lee (CPSO#: 59871)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
480 University Avenue
Suite 300
Toronto ON  M5G 1V2
Phone: (647) 260-7417
Fax: (647) 260-7600
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHELLEY LEE DEEKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEEKS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1989