Deep, Albert Ross (CPSO#: 20977)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 30 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1967
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2006
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 30 Jul 2008

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Dec 2010
Summary:

 On December 14, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Albert Ross Deep committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that having regard to all the circumstances would reasonably be regarded by 
 members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

While his certificate of registration 
 was suspended, Dr. Deep engaged in the practice of medicine in accepting a referral from another 
 physician, ordering diagnostic blood tests, diagnosing disease and prescribing medications that 
 could be dispensed only on the order of a physician. Dr. Deep was fully aware that his certificate 
 of registration had been suspended. Dr. Deep's actions constituted a deliberate flouting of the 
 College's authority.

On May 24, 2011, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that Dr. Deep 
 pay to the College costs in the amount of $10,950, to be paid within 30 days of the date of this 
 order. The Committee found that Dr. Deep has demonstrated complete ungovernability and that, if 
 Dr. Deep's certificate of registration had not already been revoked, revocation would have been 
 the appropriate penalty in this case.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 14, 2010


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Apr 2008
Summary:

 On April 29, 2008, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Deep to have committed acts of professional 
 misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and that he is 
 incompetent.

On July 30, 2008, the Discipline Committee orders and directs that:

1. 	The 
 Registrar revoke the certificate of registration of Dr. Albert Ross Deep effective 
 immediately.

2.	Dr. Deep pay to the College costs in the amount of $47,500, to be paid within 30 
 days of the date of this Order, unless the Committee has made an order following submissions that 
 varies the date or terms of payment.

On May 17, 2008, Dr. Deep appealed the decision of the 
 Discipline Committee to the Divisional Court.  Pursuant to ss.37 and 71 of the Health Professions 
 Procedural Code, the decision of the Committee remained in effect despite the appeal.  On December 
 2, 2009, the Divisional Court dismissed the appeal, Dr. Deep not having posted security for costs 
 as per the Order of Karakatsanis J. of November 17, 2009.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 02 Dec 2009
Hearing Date(s): Apr 29, 2008