Deering, Susan Alain (CPSO#: 77672)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
K G E 31
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4830
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Amica at Bayview
15 Barberry Place
Toronto ON  M2K 1G9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North York General Hospital
Doctors' Mailboxes
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN ALAIN DEERING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEERING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2004