Deernsted, Eric August (CPSO#: 26631)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 01 Feb 1980
Summary:

 In February 1980, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Deernsted guilty of professional misconduct, 
 as defined in Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he falsified a record in respect of 
 the examination or treatment of a patient, contrary to s. 26(15); and in that he committed sexual 
 impropriety with a patient, contrary to s. 26(28).  Consequently the Committee ruled that Dr. 
 Deernsted be reprimanded and that his licence be suspended for a period of thirty days.

Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 30 Jan 1980