Deforge, Daniel Arthur (CPSO#: 54560)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 05 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2009