Defreitas, Gina Angela (CPSO#: 71383)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
2221 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5
Phone: (416) 630-9984
Fax: 416-630-3649
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gina A. Defreitas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Defreitas ( CPSO# 71383 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
2221 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5
Phone Number: (416) 630-9984

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GINA ANGELA DEFREITAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEFREITAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003