Degani, Cassim Tayebbhai (CPSO#: 28501)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Bombay, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Shouldice Hospital
7750 Bayview Avenue
Thornhill ON  L3T 4A3
Phone: 905 889 1125
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C Degani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Degani ( CPSO# 28501 )
Dr. N. Degani ( CPSO# 33641 )

Business Address:
7750 Bayview Avenue
Thornhill ON  L3T 4A3
Phone Number: (905) 889-1125

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CASSIM TAYEBBHAI DEGANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEGANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Nov 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2011