Degen, Eric (CPSO#: 70323)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Toronto Hospital, Gen Div
Div of Cardiovascular Surgery (CVS)
4th Floor North Wing Suite 456
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4208
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC DEGEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEGEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1998