Degen, Ryan Michael (CPSO#: 90579)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fowler Kennedy Sports Med Clinic
1151 Richmond Street
3M Centre, Western University
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: 519-661-3011
Fax: 519-661-3379
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Hospital - LHSC
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 19129
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Degen L. McAuley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. McAuley ( CPSO# 95107 )
Dr. R. Degen ( CPSO# 90579 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Western Student Health Services
University Community Centre
Room 11
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone Number: (519) 661-3030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN MICHAEL DEGEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEGEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2015