Dehejia, Harsha Venilal (CPSO#: 23726)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Nov 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
256 Elgin Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1L9
Phone: (613) 233-3103
Fax: (613) 233-2311
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 19 Nov 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 19 Nov 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from November 19, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Harsha Venilal
            Dehejia, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Dehejia to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Dehejia may not engage in the practice of any testing for food and
                  drug allergies and in any treatment of patients for food and drug
                  allergies apart from appropriate interventions for acute emergency
                  allergic reactions (anaphylaxis) effective immediately.