Dehoney, Cameron James (CPSO#: 86074)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Apr 2007 to 06 May 2007
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 04 Sep 2007 to 16 Sep 2007
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2007 to 07 Oct 2007
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2011