Deitel, Kevin Mark (CPSO#: 65512)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Medical College of Wisconsin, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 2014