Deitel, Mervyn (CPSO#: 21092)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 24 Apr 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Apr 1996

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1967
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 24 Apr 1996

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Apr 1996
Summary:

 In April 1996, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Deitel guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in what is now s. 29(33) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he committed 
 sexual impropriety with a patient.  The Committee also found Dr. Deitel incompetent, as defined in 
 s. 61(4) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1990, as amended, in that he displayed in his professional 
 care of a patient a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the 
 patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue in practice.  
 Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Deitel(s licence to practice be revoked.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 17 Sep 1997
Hearing Date(s): Aug 09, 1994