Deitel, Wayne Lawrence (CPSO#: 66912)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1375 Lawrence Ave W
Toronto ON  M6L 1A4
Phone: (416) 243-8487
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1315 Finch Ave W
Toronto ON  M3J 2G6
Canada
Phone: (416) 633-4441
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3695 Keele St
Toronto ON  M3J 1N1
Canada
Phone: (416) 631-0007
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

660 Eglinton Ave. W Unit 5C
Mississauga ON  L5R 3V2
Canada
Phone: (905) 206-1300
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

1375 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M0L 1A4
Canada
Phone: (416) 243-8487
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1315 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3J 2G6
Canada
Phone: (416) 633-4441
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deitel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Deitel ( CPSO# 66912 )

Business Address:
711 - 208 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 2C7
Phone Number: (416) 921-1333

Business Address:
D1
2355 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6M 4A2

Business Address:
Suite 309
1371 Neilson Road
Toronto ON  M1B 4Z8

Business Address:
100A - 3695 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M3J 1N2
Phone Number: (416) 631-0007

Business Address:
114 - 1315 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3J 2G5
Phone Number: (416) 633-4441

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAYNE LAWRENCE DEITEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEITEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1998