Dekoven, Joel Glenn (CPSO#: 56171)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
M-1 Dermatology
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4908
Fax: (416) 480-6897
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Michael's Occupational
Health Centre
4Th Floor Shuter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 864-5074
Fax: (416) 864-5421
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1137 Centre Street, Suite 302
Thornhill ON  L4J 3M6
Canada
Phone: (905) 695-2020
Fax: (905) 695-3800
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

3292 Bayview Suite 301
Toronto ON  M2M 4J5
Canada
Phone: (416) 222-2200
Fax: (416) 224-9880
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel DeKoven Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dekoven ( CPSO# 56171 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Center
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite M1 Dermatology
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4908

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL GLENN DEKOVEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEKOVEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1986