Del Bel Belluz, Zoe Ann (CPSO#: 95912)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
107 King St. W
Dundas ON  L9H 1V1
Phone: (905) 628-0840
Fax: (905) 628-0843
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zoe Del Bel Belluz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Del Bel Belluz ( CPSO# 95912 )

Business Address:
107 King Street West
Lower Level Unit 1
Dundas ON  L9H 1V1
Phone Number: (905) 628-0840

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZOE ANN DEL BEL BELLUZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEL BEL BELLUZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013