Del Carpio, Agustina Raquel Zegarra (CPSO#: 33579)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Peruana Cayetano Heredia University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 24 Mar 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1982
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 29 Nov 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011