Del Giudice, Maria Elisabeth (CPSO#: 75148)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Family & Community Medicine
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room A112
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4939
Fax: (416) 480-6038
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA ELISABETH DEL GIUDICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEL GIUDICE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2002