Del Rizzo, Dario Francesco (CPSO#: 50420)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 405
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone: (905) 264-5977
Fax: (905) 264-9686
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dario Del Rizzo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Del Rizzo ( CPSO# 50420 )

Business Address:
Suite 405
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone Number: (905) 264-5977

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 28 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARIO FRANCESCO DEL RIZZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEL RIZZO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1987 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 7 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1983