Del Rosario, Daniel Sims (CPSO#: 50421)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 224
4810 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4N6
Phone: (416) 282-1922
Fax: (416) 690-7020
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3030 BIRCHMOUNT ROAD
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2600
Fax: (416) 495-2562
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3050 Lawrence AVENUE EAST
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: 4164382911
Fax: 4164318188
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Sims Del Rosario Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Del Rosario ( CPSO# 50421 )

Business Address:
Suite 224
4810 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4N6
Phone Number: (416) 282-1922

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2600

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital - General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL SIMS DEL ROSARIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEL ROSARIO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1983
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 08 Feb 2002
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 23 Apr 2002