Delacy, John Lester (CPSO#: 29121)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Monash University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Department Of Anaesthesia M3
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M7
Phone: (416) 480-4967
Fax: (416) 480-6039
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Delacy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Delacy ( CPSO# 29121 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia M3
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4967

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN LESTER DELACY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELACY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977