Delaney, David Allan (CPSO#: 94968)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Seaway Valley Community Health Centre 353 Pitt Street Cornwall, ON K6J 3R1
Date Received: 29 Apr 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 13 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016