Delaney, Holly Mary (CPSO#: 104928)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2014 to 05 Oct 2014
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Oct 2015 to 22 Nov 2015
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2015 to 20 Dec 2015
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 2015