Delaney, James Paul (CPSO#: 50417)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone: (705) 739-8363
Fax: (705) 733-8350
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Delaney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Delaney ( CPSO# 50417 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone Number: (705) 739-8363

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES PAUL DELANEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELANEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1983