Delbrouck, Nicole Frances Lucienne (CPSO#: 54055)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone: (613) 432-4851 Ext. 201
Fax: (613) 432-4349
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicole Delbrouck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Delbrouck ( CPSO# 54055 )

Business Address:
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Business Address:
St. Francis Memorial Hospital
4 St. Francis Memorial Hospital Drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Phone Number: (613) 756-3044

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4000

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Business Address:
Arnprior District and Memorial Hospital
346 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-3166

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE FRANCES LUCIENNE DELBROUCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELBROUCK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1988