Deliallisi, Ardit (CPSO#: 88407)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Albanian, English

Education:Universiteti i Tiranes, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Anatomical Pathology
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121 Ext. 2537
Fax: (519) 376-4413
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Deliallisi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Deliallisi ( CPSO# 88407 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARDIT DELIALLISI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELIALLISI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2011