Deliallisi, Enkelejda (CPSO#: 79699)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Albanian, English, Italian

Education:Universiteti i Tiranes, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dixon Medical Building
Suite 201
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone: (905) 715-8668
Fax: (905) 715-7814
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Deliallisi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Deliallisi ( CPSO# 79699 )

Business Address:
Dixon Medical Building
Suite 201
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone Number: (905) 715-8668

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ENKELEJDA DELIALLISI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELIALLISI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2008