Deliberato, Rodrigo Octavio (CPSO#: 90422)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Mogi Das Cruzes, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2009 to 26 Jun 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Jun 2009 to 01 May 2010
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 May 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2010