Dell, Sharon Doris Mielke (CPSO#: 62509)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: Mielke, Sharon Doris (used until: 14 Jul 1993 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6248
Fax: (416) 813-6246
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 21 Dec 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON DORIS MIELKE DELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 21 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991