Delle Donne, Nadia (CPSO#: 82194)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Montreal, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeshore General Hospital
160 Still View Avenue
Pointe Claire QC  H9R 2Y2
Phone: (514) 630-2225 Ext. 1198
Fax: (514) 630-2080

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADIA DELLE DONNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELLE DONNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 14 Feb 2005 to 14 Mar 2005
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Mar 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2005