Delpero, Walter (CPSO#: 54170)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613) 728-0247
Fax: (613) 728-7685
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Walter Delpero Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Delpero ( CPSO# 54170 )

Business Address:
302 - 1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone Number: (613) 728-0247

Business Address:
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 738-7100

Business Address:
Winchester District Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2422

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mckay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 756-3044

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 11 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WALTER DELPERO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELPERO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1985