Deluco, Anthony Theodore (CPSO#: 26084)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 07 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Sep 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2003
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 12 Jan 2005
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 21 Apr 2005
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 07 Sep 2005

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 02 Aug 2005
Summary:

 On August 2, 2005, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Deluco to have committed acts of professional 
 misconduct in that he sexually abused patients which was regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable and unprofessional.

On September 7, 2005, the Discipline Committee orders and 
 directs that:

1.	The Registrar revoke Dr. Deluco(s certificate of registration, such revocation 
 to take effect immediately.
2.	Dr. Deluco is required to attend before the panel to be 
 reprimanded.
3.	Dr. Deluco is required to reimburse the College for funding provided for the 
 patients under the program of therapy and/or counselling required under s.85.7 of the Code to a 
 maximum of $10,000 per patient.
4.	Dr. Deluco is required to post security acceptable to the 
 College, in the amount of $20,000 to guarantee the payment of any amounts the member may be 
 required to reimburse under the order made pursuant to ss.51(2)5.1 of the Code.
5.	Dr. Deluco is 
 required to pay part of the College(s costs, fixed in the amount of $10,000, to the College within 
 60 days of the date of this order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 09, 2005


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Apr 2005
Summary:

 On April 5, 2005, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Deluco committed professional misconduct 
 in that he committed acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to 
 all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional by  breaching the Executive Committee(s Order made February 18, 2003 by conducting 
 examinations of female patients outside the presence of a female third party who was acceptable to 
 the College.

On April 21, 2005, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed the 
 following:

1.	The Registrar suspend Dr. Deluco(s certificate of registration effective 
 immediately, for a  	period of six months, with the period of suspension to be reduced by the 
 period of 	suspension served to the date of the order since January 11, 2005, the date of the 
 interim 	suspension order.

2.	Dr. Deluco pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,000.00 
 within 30 days of the date 	of the order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 05, 2005

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 4, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Anthony Theodore Deluco to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Membership Services Department):

I Dr. Anthony T. Deluco:

(1) Certificate of registration number 26084, was a member of the College between August 23, 1979 and September 7, 2005. My certificate of registration was revoked by the Discipline Committee of the College on September 7, 2005.
(2) Confirm that I am not registered as a physician and do not hold a license to practice medicine in any jurisdiction other than Ontario, nor do I have any outstanding applications for such registration or licensure.
(3) Commenced an application before the College’s Discipline Committee for reinstatement of my certificate of registration on November 29, 2010 (the “Application”).
(4) Acknowledge that, as of the date of this Undertaking, I am the subject of an investigation by the College regarding a complaint against me by a member of the public (the “Complaint”). The Complaint pertains to conduct that allegedly took place while I was a member of the College.
(5) Acknowledge that there has been no referral to the Discipline Committee of the College in respect of the Complaint and that the concerns arising in the Complaint were not proven before the Discipline Committee.
(6) Hereby irrevocably withdraw my Application.
(7) Hereby undertake not to apply for registration to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
(8) Agree that if that the College becomes aware that I have applied for registration to practise medicine in any jurisdiction in breach of this Undertaking, the College shall have the right to re-commence the investigation of the Complaint which was terminated as a result of this Undertaking, and/or proceed with a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.