Demaerschalk, Bart Martha Maurice (CPSO#: 68266)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cerebrovascular Diseases Center
Mayo Clinic Hospital - Neurology
13400 E Shea Blvd
Scottsdale AZ  85259
United States
Phone: (480) 301-8100
Fax: (480) 301 8451

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona
USA - Florida
USA - Georgia
USA - Iowa
USA - Maine
USA - Minnesota
USA - Missouri
USA - Nevada
USA - New Hampshire
USA - Vermont
USA - Wisconsin

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BART MARTHA MAURICE DEMAERSCHALK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEMAERSCHALK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999