Demarco, Carolyn Mary (CPSO#: 25938)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 May 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2017