Deme, Srikanth Reddy (CPSO#: 67610)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Osmania University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 16 Dec 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Nov 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 15 Dec 1994
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 16 Dec 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 15 Dec 1995
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 16 Dec 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 14 Dec 1996
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 15 Dec 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1997