Demers, Virginie (CPSO#: 104658)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2015