Demeter, Sandor Jean (CPSO#: 63356)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Feb 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Feb 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nuclear Medicine
Health Sciences Centre
820 Sherbrook Street
Winnipeg MB  R3A 1R9
Phone: (204) 787-3375
Fax: (204) 787-3090

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDOR JEAN DEMETER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEMETER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1991