Demettino Castro Rocha Barra, Lorena (CPSO#: 106850)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 4168137500
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORENA DEMETTINO CASTRO ROCHA BARRA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. DEMETTINO CASTRO ROCHA BARRA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. DEMETTINO CASTRO ROCHA BARRA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DEMETTINO CASTRO ROCHA BARRA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. DEMETTINO CASTRO ROCHA BARRA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. DEMETTINO CASTRO ROCHA BARRA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. DEMETTINO CASTRO ROCHA BARRA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018