Demianczuk, Nestor Nicholas (CPSO#: 33242)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Montreal, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 1989